Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severo Tomás Auter, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629¹BornPuigcerdá
13 Nov 167950.8AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
11 Feb 168051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
5 Sep 168556.6SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
18 Mar 168657.2ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
24 Dec 170071.9DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Severo Tomás Auter:
Bishop Severo Tomás Auter O.P. (born 1629, died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183, and Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,035
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 220, Number 1,364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015