Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Karnkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472¹BornZmigród
29 Apr 152755.3AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
20 Sep 152856.7Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
4 Aug 153159.6AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
2 Dec 153765.9DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Karnkowski:
Bishop Jan Karnkowski (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013