Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rüdiger von Bergheim (Radeck)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1175¹Born
1216¹41.0AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
1216²41.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
27 Jun 123358.4AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
20 Mar 125075.2ResignedBishop of Passau, Germany
14 Apr 125883.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rüdiger von Bergheim (Radeck) (VIAF: 81172252)
Bishop Rüdiger von Bergheim (Radeck) (born 1175, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passau

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHerrenchiemsee

  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 392, and Page 184
  • ob/c2: ATh, 26 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast