Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Blanco Salcedo

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1512BornCapillas
12 Jun 155644.4AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
23 Aug 155644.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
13 Apr 156553.3AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
4 Jun 157462.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
26 Apr 158169.3DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Blanco Salcedo:
Archbishop Francisco Blanco Salcedo (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,044
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 66, Number 382
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 1 Dec 2013