Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Sanclemente Torquemada

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1534Born
7 Jul 157843.8AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
25 Jan 157944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Jul 158752.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Apr 160267.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Sanclemente Torquemada
Archbishop Juan de Sanclemente Torquemada (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Death PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173, and Page 124
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 90, Number 559
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast