Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Szołdrski

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583²BornCzempiń
9 Jan 163451.0AppointedBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine
11 Jun 163451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine
13 Aug 163552.6AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Jul 163653.5AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
25 Sep 163653.7InstalledBishop of Poznań, Poland
1 Apr 165067.2DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Szołdrski:
Bishop Andrzej Szołdrski (died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287, and Page 149
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015