Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theobald

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Dec 1138AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
8 Jan 1139Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
18 Apr 1161DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Theobald :
Archbishop Theobald (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 8
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014