Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1158AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
13 Apr 1158Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
31 Jul 1160DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alfred :
Bishop Alfred (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 48
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014