Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Chesney

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Dec 1148AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 1148Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 1148Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 1168DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Chesney
Bishop Robert de Chesney (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 47
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 8
  • ab/op: CB, 20 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016