Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Albéric Cardinal , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1080¹Born
1138²58.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
1138²58.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Apr 113858.2Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
20 Nov 114868.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albéric
Albéric Cardinal O.S.B. (born 1080, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeauvais, France
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVerdun

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1138
  • b/c2: ATh, 13 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,869

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast