Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Krzysztof Antoni Szembek

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1667BornSzczepanowo
5 Jul 169225.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 171143.9AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
15 Sep 171144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
1 Jul 171649.2AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Jul 172053.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Jan 173971.7SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Jun 173972.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
6 Jul 174881.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Antoni Szembek:
Archbishop Krzysztof Antoni Szembek (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,859
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 322, and Page 408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015