Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Surredu

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹Born
13 Aug 160140.6AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
17 Jun 160241.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
Aug 1605³44.5DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Surredu
Bishop Antonio Surredu (born 1561, died Aug 1605) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 355
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,601, Number 41
  • ob/c23: AT, 1 Dec 2019
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast