Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Atzori

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹Born
1 Sep 159248.6AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
25 Feb 159349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
24 Jul 160460.5DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Atzori
Bishop Antonio Atzori (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Bosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopSan Lussorio, Church, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 664
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 26
  • ob/loc: AT, 1 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 1 Dec 2019

Quantcast