Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Laso Sedeño

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1587AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
7 Feb 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Gaeta, Italy
7 Feb 1596AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
1 Dec 1604AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mallorca, Spain
21 Aug 1607DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Laso Sedeño (VIAF: 18146030602935862398)
Archbishop Alfonso Laso Sedeño (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlmeto, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopS. Jacques des Espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMallorca, Diocese of Mallorca
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter Chapel, Cathedral, Mallorca, Diocese of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 27, Number 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 100, Number 632
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 5
  • loc: AT, 1 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 1 Dec 2019

Quantcast