Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adeodato Summantico, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1658³Born
22 Feb 168324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1711²52.1AppointedPrior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
12 Apr 171758.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 Apr 171758.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
21 Dec 173577.1DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Summantico
Bishop Adeodato Summantico O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoggia

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast