Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Strozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1673BornFlorence
5 Jun 170026.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 171642.8AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
12 Jul 171642.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
8 Jan 173662.3DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Strozzi:
Bishop Luigi Maria Strozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013