Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Spínola, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Savona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1677³Born
6 Mar 170022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
30 Mar 171639.0AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
5 Apr 1716³39.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
23 Sep 172245.5AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
16 Oct 175578.5DiedBishop of Savona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Spínola
Bishop Agostino Spínola C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Savona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1755
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68, and Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 38
  • ob/c2: AT, 18 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,610

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast