Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Serguidi

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Oct 1574AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
28 Oct 1574Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
1 May 1598DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Serguidi (VIAF: 304919345)
Bishop Guido Serguidi (died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,820
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast