Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano (Agostino) Cardinal Bonucci, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1521²Born
23 Jan 157352.0AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
1 Oct 157453.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
18 Dec 158766.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 158867.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
2 Jan 158968.0DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano (Agostino) Bonucci
Stefano (Agostino) Cardinal Bonucci O.S.M. (born 1521, died ) Bishop of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo
Death PlaceServites, Monastery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 116, and Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast