Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottaviano Pasqua

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1541Born
17 Sep 157432.8AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
29 Sep 157432.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
8 Jan 159149.1DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Pasqua
Bishop Ottaviano Pasqua (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenes
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGerace, Diocese of Gerace

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast