Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre de Campo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1665Ordained BishopTitular Bishop
3 Jul 1666ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
3 Jul 1666AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
16 Jul 1685DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

MicroData Summary for Alexandre de Campo:
Bishop Alexandre de Campo (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 237, and Page 167
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,234
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 200, Number 1,252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013