Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Terrones del Caño

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551²BornAndújar
11 May 160150.3AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
25 Jul 160150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
3 Mar 160857.1AppointedBishop of León, Spain
13 Mar 161362.1DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Terrones del Caño:
Bishop Francisco Terrones del Caño (died ) Bishop of León

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,831
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,962
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 116, Number 735
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218, and Page 348
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015