Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Kridt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Mar 1550AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
19 Mar 1550AppointedTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
14 Sep 1550Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acre (or Ptolomais)
16 Sep 1577DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Kridt (VIAF: 220966366)
Bishop Johannes Kridt (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNienborg
Ordained BishopMarienfeld

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,550, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast