Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pérez Calama

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1740BornAlberca, Spain
30 Mar 178948.3AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
23 Aug 178948.7Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
2 Dec 179252.0ResignedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Pérez Calama:
Bishop José Pérez Calama (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quito

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 107, Number 555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013