Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lazzaro Sangiovanni

Deceased

Bishop of Bitetto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1684BornRuggiano
7 Mar 172844.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172945.4AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
25 Jul 172945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
5 Oct 173652.7DiedBishop of Bitetto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Sangiovanni:
Bishop Lazzaro Sangiovanni (died ) Bishop of Bitetto

  • a priest for 8.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014