Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bonardo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1591AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
24 Mar 1591³Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
11 Mar 1601DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bonardo (VIAF: 88719603)
Bishop Vincenzo Bonardo O.P. (died ) Bishop of Gerace

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast