Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Laureti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1534Born
13 Feb 159156.3AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
24 Feb 159156.4Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
29 Jan 159863.3DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Laureti
Bishop Lorenzo Laureti O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopS.Maria in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 6.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast