Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tristan de Salazar

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1447¹Born
25 Jun 147326.4AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
26 Sep 147427.7AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
11 Feb 151972.1DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tristan de Salazar (VIAF: 316443609)
Archbishop Tristan de Salazar (born 1447, died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 235, and Page 189
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1473, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast