Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baillet

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1478AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
13 Sep 1478Ordained BishopBishop of Auxerre, France
10 Nov 1513DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Baillet
Bishop Jean Baillet (died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast