Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Huillier

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Jun 1483AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
7 Aug 1483Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
21 Nov 1500DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Huillier:
Bishop Jean d’Huillier (died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 189
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013