Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Saladini

Deceased

Bishop of Parma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹BornAscoli Piceno
23 Jun 168134.4AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
7 Jul 168134.5Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
21 Aug 169447.6DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Saladini:
Bishop Tommaso Saladini (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a bishop for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 308
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015