Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giosuč Maria Saggese, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1800Born
22 Jun 181717.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Jun 182323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Feb 183837.7SelectedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
17 Sep 183838.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
23 Sep 183838.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
24 Apr 185251.9DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giosuč Maria Saggese (VIAF: 89429637)
Archbishop Giosuč Maria Saggese C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttaviano

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 364
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,838, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast