Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simeone Difnico

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1613Born
25 Jun 164632.7AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
10 May 164935.6AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
24 May 166147.6DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simeone Difnico
Bishop Simeone Difnico (born , died ) Bishop of Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibenic

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185, and Page 261
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast