Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Rodríguez Gil, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1782Born
12 Sep 184765.1SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
17 Dec 184765.4ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
21 May 184865.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
7 Apr 185774.7DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Rodríguez Gil
Bishop Santiago Rodríguez Gil O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cristina de Valeje
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo el Real, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,487
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 155, Number 847
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,848, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast