Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Greenfield

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1304SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
30 Jan 1306Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
6 Dec 1315DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Greenfield:
Archbishop William Greenfield (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013