Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Baldock

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1304SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
30 Jan 1306Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
24 Jul 1313DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Baldock: VIAF:268987682
Bishop Ralph Baldock (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015