Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe de Fusco

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1661³BornGraniani, Italy
7 Feb 172968.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
3 Apr 172968.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Fusco:
Bishop Giuseppe de Fusco (born ) Titular Bishop of Bethsaida

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015