Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Riccio

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹Born
20 Dec 162750.9AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
30 Jan 162851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
6 Jan 164366.0DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Riccio
Bishop Luigi Riccio (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maddalena, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 44
  • ob/c2: AT, 11 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast