Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich von Bülow

Deceased

Bishop of Lebus, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460¹Born
1479¹19.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 149030.8SelectedBishop of Lebus, Germany
5 Nov 149030.8ConfirmedBishop of Lebus, Germany
1 Oct 152363.7DiedBishop of Lebus, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich von Bülow (VIAF: 13419993)
Bishop Dietrich von Bülow (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Lebus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmt Neuhaus

  • a priest for 44.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,490, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast