Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard von Rüppurr (Rippur)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1458¹Born
19 Aug 150345.6SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
9 Feb 150446.1ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
7 Oct 150446.7Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
18 Dec 152365.9ResignedBishop of Worms, Germany
19 Apr 153375.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reinhard von Rüppurr (Rippur) (VIAF: 3289043)
Bishop Reinhard von Rüppurr (Rippur) (born 1458, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Worms

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLadenburg

  • a bishop for 28.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 5*
  • ob/r: CB, 26 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast