Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kajetan Maria (Ignaz Judas Thaddäus) Reisach, C.R. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1735³BornSandelzhausen
1752¹16.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
11 Jun 175822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
11 Apr 179155.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
15 May 179155.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
18 Jun 180569.8DiedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kajetan Maria (Ignaz Judas Thaddäus) Reisach
Bishop Kajetan Maria (Ignaz Judas Thaddäus) Reisach C.R. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,098
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016