Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelio di San Giuseppe (Giuseppe) Reina, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ispahan, Iran


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1710Born
16 May 173019.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
2 Oct 175847.9AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
10 Oct 1759³48.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
May 1797³86.4DiedBishop of Ispahan, Iran

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelio di San Giuseppe (Giuseppe) Reina
Bishop Cornelio di San Giuseppe (Giuseppe) Reina O.C.D. (born , died May 1797) Bishop of Ispahan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,692
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018