Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavien-Michel Malké

Deceased

Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1858²Born
1883²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
189941.0SelectedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey
14 Sep 191254.7ConfirmedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey
19 Jan 191355.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey
29 Aug 191557.6DiedBishop of Gazireh (Gezira) (Syrian), Turkey
29 Aug 2015Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flavien-Michel Malké
Bishop Flavien-Michel Malké (born 1858, died ) Bishop of Gazireh (Gezira)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalaat Mara

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 5
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2015
  • beat: CB, 14 Aug 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast