Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanase Jules Benham Kalian

Deceased

Archbishop of Baghdad (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1883BornMossul
19 Jul 190824.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 192137.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
26 Feb 192137.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
21 Nov 192138.0ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
30 Apr 192238.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
6 Aug 192945.7AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
17 Feb 194965.2DiedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Athanase Jules Benham Kalian:
Archbishop Athanase Jules Benham Kalian (born , died ) Archbishop of Baghdad

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013