Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Sandwich

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1262SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
27 May 1263Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 1273DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Sandwich
Bishop Henry Sandwich (died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 62
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 286
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast