Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel José Pratmans Llambés

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1808Born
5 Jun 185951.0SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Sep 185951.3ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
8 Jan 186051.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1 Jan 186152.5DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel José Pratmans Llambés
Bishop Miguel José Pratmans Llambés (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Cardosa, Diocese of Solsona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tortosa, Diocese of Tortosa

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 923
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast