Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Potenza

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1885Born
12 Mar 191024.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 193145.9AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
3 Jan 193246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
11 Jan 195872.3DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Potenza
Bishop Francesco Potenza (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNardò

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast