Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Filippo Porporato

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1698BornPiasco
12 Apr 172122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 172123.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174142.7SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 Apr 174142.8ConfirmedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
23 Apr 174142.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
29 Jun 174143.0InstalledBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Jul 178183.1DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Filippo Porporato:
Bishop Giuseppe Filippo Porporato (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015