Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Filippo Felissano

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1697BornFossano
5 May 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 174143.7SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
17 Apr 174143.8ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
25 Apr 174143.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
1 Apr 175759.8DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Filippo Felissano:
Bishop Giuseppe Filippo Felissano (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015