Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Cardinal Ponzetti (Poncetti)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1444Born
20 Apr 151773.3AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
1 Jul 151773.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151773.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
21 Dec 151773.9Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
12 Jul 151874.5ResignedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
22 Dec 152278.9AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
25 Feb 152783.1ResignedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
9 Sep 152783.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Ponzetti (Poncetti)
Ferdinando Cardinal Ponzetti (Poncetti) (born 1444, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241, and Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1517, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast